Global Patent Index - EP 1239763 A1

EP 1239763 A1 2002-09-18 - UNIVERSAL INSTRUMENT BASE ASSEMBLY FOR A RETRACTOR

Title (en)

UNIVERSAL INSTRUMENT BASE ASSEMBLY FOR A RETRACTOR

Title (de)

UNIVERSELLE INSTRUMENTENBASISANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN RETRAKTOR

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE FORMANT BASE D'INSTRUMENT UNIVERSEL POUR UN ECARTEUR

Publication

EP 1239763 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00984097 A

Priority

  • US 0033384 W
  • US 17033099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141633A1] A universal instrument base assembly which is selectively engageable with a surgical retractor (40) includes a mounting plate (30) having a mechanical interface which releasably engages the surgical retractor and an instrument base plate (20) which includes a first portion which releasably engages the mounting plate and a second portion which releasably engages a surgical instrument. The mechanical interface of the mounting plate is adjustable to releasably engage a variety of different surgical retractors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 19/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/02 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/0206 (2013.01); A61B 90/50 (2016.02); A61B 2017/00243 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0243 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141633 A1 20010614; AU 2077501 A 20010618; AU 778610 B2 20041216; CA 2393167 A1 20010614; EP 1239763 A1 20020918; EP 1239763 A4 20090902; JP 2003523229 A 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100203

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090922

2009-09-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090805

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAFFEI, FRANK, C.

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI