Global Patent Index - EP 1239783 A1

EP 1239783 A1 2002-09-18 - TONGUE CLEANING DEVICE

Title (en)

TONGUE CLEANING DEVICE

Title (de)

ZUNGENREINIGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DE LA LANGUE

Publication

EP 1239783 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99966561 A

Priority

US 9930628 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145573A1] Disclosed is a tongue cleaning device comprising a body having a handle and at one end thereof a head provided with a plurality of convex extrusions on at least one side of the head. Also disclosed is a tongue cleaning device comprised of a body having a handle and at one end thereof a head provided with at least one raised ridge. Also disclosed is a device wherein the head is further provided with tooth-cleaning bristles on the side of the head that is opposite to the side that is provided with the convex extrusions or with the at least one raised ridge. Still further disclosed is a tongue cleaning device comprised of a body having a handle and at one end thereof a head provided with tooth-cleaning bristles extending from the head on one side of the head, the tooth cleaning bristles further extending through the head to a height of up to about 7 mm on the opposite side of the head to form extension bristles for tongue cleaning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/24; A46B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 15/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 15/0081 (2013.01); A46B 15/0055 (2013.01); A61B 17/244 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145573A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145573 A1 20010628; AU 2207200 A 20010703; CA 2394842 A1 20010628; CN 1406119 A 20030326; EP 1239783 A1 20020918; MX PA02006372 A 20021129; PL 355384 A1 20040419

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCKLEY, CHRISTOPHER, DAVID

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHAN, JOHN GEOFFREY

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FENG, BORU

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WANG, PING

2004-01-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031021

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCKLEY, CHRISTOPHER, DAVID

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHAN, JOHN GEOFFREY

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FENG, BORU

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WANG, PING

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCKLEY, CHRISTOPHER, DAVID

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHAN, JOHN GEOFFREY

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FENG, BORU

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WANG, PING

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI