Global Patent Index - EP 1239825 A1

EP 1239825 A1 2002-09-18 - CATECHOL OXIMES AND THEIR USE IN COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS

Title (en)

CATECHOL OXIMES AND THEIR USE IN COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS

Title (de)

CATECHOLOXIME UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN KOSMETISCHEN UND DERMATOLOGISCHEN ZUBEREITUNGEN

Title (fr)

CATECHOLOXIMES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES ET DERMATOLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 1239825 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00979656 A

Priority

  • DE 19960105 A
  • EP 0012111 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143712A1] The invention relates to cosmetic and/or dermatological preparations which contain, in part, novel catechol oximes of formula (I). Said preparations can promote, in physiological systems, the natural defense mechanisms against free radicals and reactive oxygen compounds, or can be used as protective agents in cosmetic or pharmaceutical products whose oxidation-sensitive constituents should be protected from autooxidation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 7/42; C07C 251/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/06 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 31/15 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/537 (2006.01); A61K 31/54 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 39/06 (2006.01); A61Q 17/00 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/08 (2006.01); C07C 249/08 (2006.01); C07C 251/48 (2006.01); C07C 251/50 (2006.01); C07D 521/00 (2006.01); C09K 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/40 (2013.01); A61Q 17/00 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61K 2800/522 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143712A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143712 A1 20010621; AU 1706701 A 20010625; CN 1409626 A 20030409; DE 19960105 A1 20010621; EP 1239825 A1 20020918; JP 2003516953 A 20030520; US 2003049287 A1 20030313

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEY, JAKOB, PETER

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOHNCOCK, WILLIAM

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAULEN, JOHANNES

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI