Global Patent Index - EP 1239827 A1

EP 1239827 A1 2002-09-18 - TRANSPARENT SOFTENING AGENTS

Title (en)

TRANSPARENT SOFTENING AGENTS

Title (de)

TRANSPARENTE AVIVAGEMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENTS D'AVIVAGE TRANSPARENTS

Publication

EP 1239827 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00981379 A

Priority

  • DE 19962874 A
  • EP 0012811 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19962874A1] Transparent conditioner composition comprises an esterquat and an additive selected from optionally quaternized fatty acid amido amines, betaines, nonionic surfactants, polyols, polyol derivatives, alcohols and/or hydrotropes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/50; C11D 1/62; C11D 1/645; C11D 1/835

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/44 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/645 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); D06M 13/148 (2006.01); D06M 13/165 (2006.01); D06M 13/17 (2006.01); D06M 13/224 (2006.01); D06M 13/256 (2006.01); D06M 13/292 (2006.01); D06M 13/342 (2006.01); D06M 13/402 (2006.01); D06M 13/405 (2006.01); D06M 13/419 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 13/467 (2006.01); D06M 15/03 (2006.01); D06M 15/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/42 (2013.01); A61K 8/345 (2013.01); A61K 8/44 (2013.01); A61K 8/604 (2013.01); A61Q 5/12 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/645 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); D06M 13/148 (2013.01); D06M 13/165 (2013.01); D06M 13/224 (2013.01); D06M 13/2243 (2013.01); D06M 13/256 (2013.01); D06M 13/292 (2013.01); D06M 13/342 (2013.01); D06M 13/405 (2013.01); D06M 13/463 (2013.01); D06M 13/467 (2013.01); D06M 15/03 (2013.01); D06M 15/53 (2013.01); D06M 2200/00 (2013.01); D06M 2200/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147489A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19962874 A1 20010628; AU 1864101 A 20010709; EP 1239827 A1 20020918; EP 1239827 B1 20041013; ES 2231291 T3 20050516; JP 2003519294 A 20030617; US 2003130162 A1 20030710; US 8765154 B2 20140701; WO 0147489 A1 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151216

2017-01-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170127

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151215

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151215

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008269

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-06-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090507 AND 20090513

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231291 T3

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20041013

2005-03-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050207

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008269 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIGORRA LLOSAS, JOAQUIN

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BONASTRE GILABERT, NURIA

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PI SUBIRANA, RAFAEL

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CALDERO, GABRIELA

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IBERIA, S.L.

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIGORRA LLOSAS, JOAQUIN

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BONASTRE GILABERT, NURIA

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PI SUBIRANA, RAFAEL

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CALDERO, GABRIELA

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI