Global Patent Index - EP 1239866 A1

EP 1239866 A1 2002-09-18 - INDUCING CELLULAR IMMUNE RESPONSES TO HER2/neu USING PEPTIDE AND NUCLEIC ACID COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

INDUCING CELLULAR IMMUNE RESPONSES TO HER2/neu USING PEPTIDE AND NUCLEIC ACID COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

INDUZIERUNG VON ZELLULÄRER IMMUNANTWORT AUF HER2/NEU MIT HILFE VON PEPTID- UND NEUKLEINSÄUREZUBEREITUNGEN

Title (fr)

INDUCTION DE REPONSES IMMUNES CELLULAIRES A HER2/NEU A L'AIDE DE COMPOSITIONS RENFERMANT DES PEPTIDES ET DES ACIDES NUCLEIQUES

Publication

EP 1239866 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00984214 A

Priority

  • US 0033591 W
  • US 45829999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141787A1] This invention uses our knoeledge of the mechanisms by which antigen is recognized by T cells to identify and prepare HER2/neu epitopes, and to develop epitope-based vaccines directed towards HERS2/neu-bearing tumors. More specifically, this application communicates our discovery of pharmaceutical compositions and methods of use in the prevention and treatment of cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A61K 38/03; A61K 38/08; A61K 38/10; A61K 38/16; C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C07K 7/00; C07K 9/00; C07K 14/435

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/03 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 7/08 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 14/725 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/0011 (2013.01); C07K 14/71 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5154 (2013.01); A61K 2039/605 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141787 A1 20010614; AU 2087401 A 20010618; CA 2393738 A1 20010614; EP 1239866 A1 20020918; EP 1239866 A4 20050209; EP 1568373 A2 20050831; EP 1568373 A3 20051221; JP 2003530083 A 20031014

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FIKES, JOHN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SETTE, ALESSANDRO

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIDNEY, JOHN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOUTHWOOD, SCOTT

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHESNUT, ROBERT

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CELIS, ESTEBAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KEOGH, ELISSA

2005-11-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-02-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041227

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FIKES, JOHN

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SETTE, ALESSANDRO

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIDNEY, JOHN

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOUTHWOOD, SCOTT

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHESNUT, ROBERT

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CELIS, ESTEBAN

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KEOGH, ELISSA

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI