Global Patent Index - EP 1239922 A2

EP 1239922 A2 2002-09-18 - TREATMENT OF EXCESSIVE BONE OR CARTILAGE LOSS WITH AN ACTIVATOR OF ROR ALPHA AND ASSAY FOR IDENTIFYING SUCH ACTIVATOR

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF EXCESSIVE BONE OR CARTILAGE LOSS WITH AN ACTIVATOR OF ROR ALPHA AND ASSAY FOR IDENTIFYING SUCH ACTIVATOR

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG VON ÜBERMÄSSIGEM KNOCHEN- ODER KNORPELVERLUST DURCH EINEN ROR ALPHA-AKTIVATOR UND EIN TESTVERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG DESSELBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DOSAGE

Publication

EP 1239922 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00972703 A

Priority

  • EP 0009883 W
  • GB 9924057 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0126737A2] A method for the identification of a compound having bone growth promoting activity comprising contacting a test compound with a biological system which comprises a functional ROR alpha receptor and which is capable of generating a detectable signal in response to activation of the ROR alpha receptor by a compound having bone growth promoting activity, and monitoring the system for the generation of the signal and the use of such compounds for the prophylaxis or treatment of diseases or medical conditions which involve excessive bone or cartilage loss.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61P 19/02; A61K 45/00; A61P 19/10; G01N 33/566

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/6887 (2013.01); G01N 33/566 (2013.01); G01N 2333/70567 (2013.01); G01N 2500/00 (2013.01); G01N 2800/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0126737A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0126737 A2 20010419; WO 0126737 A3 20011018; AU 1134601 A 20010423; EP 1239922 A2 20020918; GB 9924057 D0 19991215; JP 2003511426 A 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2004-12-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI