Global Patent Index - EP 1239944 A1

EP 1239944 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCTION OF A HOMOGENEOUS MIXTURE OF A VAPOUR-FORMING AROMATIC HYDROCARBON AND AN OXYGEN-CONTAINING GAS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCTION OF A HOMOGENEOUS MIXTURE OF A VAPOUR-FORMING AROMATIC HYDROCARBON AND AN OXYGEN-CONTAINING GAS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES HOMOGENEN GEMISCHES AUS EINEM DAMPFFÖRMIGEN AROMATISCHEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFF UND EINEM SAUERSTOFF ENTHALTENDEN GAS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UN MELANGE HOMOGENE CONSTITUE D'UN HYDROCARBURE AROMATIQUE A L'ETAT DE VAPEUR ET D'UN GAZ CONTENANT DE L'OXYGENE

Publication

EP 1239944 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00985245 A

Priority

  • DE 19962616 A
  • EP 0013165 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19962616A1] Production of a homogeneous mixture of an aromatic hydrocarbon vapor and an oxygen containing gas for catalytic gas phase reactions, comprises spraying droplets of the liquid aromatic hydrocarbon having a diameter of less than 1 mm, into the oxygen containing gas stream, heated to above the b.pt. of the hydrocarbon, by means of nozzles, preferably rifled nozzles to form a hollow cone. An Independent claim is included for a device for the production of the vapor mixture (I) having gas channels (11) for the pre-heated oxygen containing gas stream (12); a spray device (13) opening into one channel (11) for a liquid aromatic hydrocarbon stream whereby the spray device (13) has rifled nozzles (15) and the gas channels (11) have walls (18) that extend at least away from the nozzles (15) and are heated to at least the b.pt. of the hydrocarbon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/04; B01F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/02 (2006.01); B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/20 (2006.01); B01F 15/06 (2006.01); B01F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0451 (2013.01); B01F 3/04049 (2013.01); B01F 5/0602 (2013.01); B01F 2005/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147622A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19962616 A1 20010628; AT 262372 T 20040415; AU 2172001 A 20010709; CN 1174793 C 20041110; CN 1411392 A 20030416; EP 1239944 A1 20020918; EP 1239944 B1 20040324; ES 2218265 T3 20041116; JP 2003518433 A 20030610; JP 4669184 B2 20110413; MX PA02005852 A 20021023; MY 125936 A 20060929; TW 581710 B 20040401; US 2003013931 A1 20030116; WO 0147622 A1 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101222

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040824

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218265 T3

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-06-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005821 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI