Global Patent Index - EP 1239960 A1

EP 1239960 A1 2002-09-18 - MICRO-TITER PLATE AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME

Title (en)

MICRO-TITER PLATE AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME

Title (de)

MEHRGEFÄSSPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PLAQUE A MICROTITRATION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1239960 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00988309 A

Priority

  • EP 00988309 A
  • EP 99204505 A
  • US 0035092 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1110611A1] The present invention provides a method of manufacturing a micro-titer test plate comprising a plurality of sample containers (10) connected to each other of which each sample container (10) has one or more side walls enclosing the interior of said sample container, a bottom wall with an outlet opening and an opposite upper end that is open and defines an inlet opening (14), said method comprising the steps of: providing a first (60,61,110,120) and second part (50,80,200), said first part (60,61,110,120) comprising a plurality of wells (30,115,125) connected to each other and each having an upper end that is open and that will define the inlet opening (14,114,124) of said sample containers (10) and an opposite bottom opening (16,116,126) and said second part (50,80,200) comprising a plurality of spouts (24) connected to each other, said spouts (24) conforming in arrangement and number to said wells (30,115,125) of said first part (60,61,110,120) and each spout (24) enclosing at a first end (23,201) an opening (22,202) that will define the outlet opening of said sample containers (10), and each spout (24) optionally having an upper opening (55) at said first end (23) for receiving a filter means (39); placing a filter sheet (1,5) that extents across each of said wells (30,115,125) of said first part (60,61,110,120) on one side of said first part or placing a filter sheet (1,5) that extends across each of said spouts (24) of said second part (50,80,200) on the side of said second part having said first ends (23,201); separating from said filter sheet (1,5) filter means (39) that conform in shape, size, arrangement and number to either the bottom opening (16,116,126) of the wells of said first part (60,61,110,120) or when present, to said optional upper openings (55) provided at the first end (23,201) of the spouts (24); placing said filter means (39) in each of the bottom openings (16,116,126) of the wells or when present in each of said upper openings (55) provided at the first end (23,201) of the spouts (24); removing the remainder of said filter sheet (1,5) from which the filter means (39) have been separated; bringing said first part (60,61,110,120) and said second part (50,80,200) in contact with each other such that the bottom opening (16,116,126) of said wells face the first end (23,201) of said spouts (24); and bonding said first part (60,61,110,120) and said second part (50,80,200) to each other by permanently and irreversibly bonding each of the wells (30,115,125) of said first part (60,61,110,120) to each of the spouts (24) of said second part (50,80,200) thereby forming a plurality of sample containers (10) connected to each other that are sealed with respect to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/00; B01D 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); B01D 61/18 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/50255 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145844A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1110611 A1 20010627; AT 327829 T 20060615; AU 2453101 A 20010703; DE 60028413 D1 20060706; DE 60028413 T2 20061130; EP 1239960 A1 20020918; EP 1239960 B1 20060531; JP 2003518248 A 20030603; JP 4602623 B2 20101222; WO 0145844 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131221

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131221

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061221

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060901

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061221

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-09-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60028413 P 20060706

2006-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOLL, KARL-ANDREAS

2006-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECK, ROLAND

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOLL, KARL-ANDREAS

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECK, ROLAND

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI