Global Patent Index - EP 1239965 A1

EP 1239965 A1 2002-09-18 - MULTIPLE TOOL ATTACHMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

MULTIPLE TOOL ATTACHMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER WERKZEUGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FIXATION D'OUTILS MULTIPLE

Publication

EP 1239965 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00970880 A

Priority

  • US 0028367 W
  • US 15986999 P
  • US 19579700 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0128687A1] A multiple attachment system is adapted to be attached to demolition equipment. The system includes a universal body (18) attached to the demolition equipment. A series of tools are independently attached to the universal body. The universal body includes a guide slot (44) extending longitudinally along the universal body. Each tool includes a pair of pivotable jaws (12, 14) adapted to be pivotably attached to the universal body with at least one linkage (24, 28) extending from the universal body and attachable to each jaw of the tool. A slide member (32) is received within the guide slot, with each linkage attached to the slide member, and a piston cylinder arrangement (38) is attached to the universal body and coupled to the slide member for moving the slide member and the jaws. The multiple tool attachment system is provided with quick change features and is designed to optimize the cutting characteristics throughout the movement cycle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/36 (2006.01); A62B 3/00 (2006.01); B02C 1/00 (2006.01); B02C 1/02 (2006.01); B23D 17/00 (2006.01); B23D 17/06 (2006.01); B23D 31/00 (2006.01); B23D 35/00 (2006.01); B25F 1/02 (2006.01); E02F 3/96 (2006.01); E04G 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/149 (2013.01); A62B 3/005 (2013.01); B23D 17/00 (2013.01); B23D 31/008 (2013.01); E02F 3/965 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0128687 A1 20010426; AU 8019700 A 20010430; CA 2387725 A1 20010426; CA 2387725 C 20110510; EP 1239965 A1 20020918; EP 1239965 A4 20090805; EP 2468406 A1 20120627; JP 2003512182 A 20030402; JP 5183843 B2 20130417

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160412

2011-11-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100121

2009-08-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090706

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR LI

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI