Global Patent Index - EP 1239981 A1

EP 1239981 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR VERTICAL CONTINUOUS CASTING OF METALS USING ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELDS AND CASTING INSTALLATION THEREFOR

Title (en)

METHOD FOR VERTICAL CONTINUOUS CASTING OF METALS USING ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELDS AND CASTING INSTALLATION THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERTIKALES STRANGGIESSVERFAHREN FÜR METALLE UNTER VERWENDUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER FELDER UND ANLAGE ZUR DESSEN DURCHFÜHRUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COULEE CONTINUE VERTICALE DES METAUX UTILISANT DES CHAMPS ELECTROMAGNETIQUES ET INSTALLATION DE COULEE POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 1239981 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00981421 A

Priority

  • FR 0003191 W
  • FR 9914816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138022A1] The invention concerns a method which consists in: simultaneously subjecting the meniscus of the molten metal present in the ingot mould to the action of an axial alternating electromagnetic field tending to provide it with a general dome-like shape and to the action of a transverse direct electromagnetic field designed to attenuate the surface agitation of the meniscus. The implementing installation comprises an ingot mould (1) with cooled assembled plates (2, 3 and 4, 5) for casting metal slabs, an alternating current coil (17) enclosing the ingot mould at the meniscus (12) of the molten metal to produce an axial magnetic field, collinear with the casting axis (11), and a direct magnetic field winding passing through the large plates of the ingot mould at the meniscus (12) perpendicular to the casting axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10; B22D 11/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/049 (2006.01); B22D 11/051 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/115 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0138022A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138022 A1 20010531; AT 245068 T 20030815; AU 1867601 A 20010604; AU 778670 B2 20041216; AU 778670 C 20051117; BR 0015748 A 20020716; CA 2391235 A1 20010531; CA 2391235 C 20081014; CN 1198695 C 20050427; CN 1399584 A 20030226; DE 60003945 D1 20030821; DE 60003945 T2 20040603; EP 1239981 A1 20020918; EP 1239981 B1 20030716; FR 2801523 A1 20010601; FR 2801523 B1 20011228; JP 2003514669 A 20030422; JP 2007000936 A 20070111; JP 3904226 B2 20070411; JP 4824502 B2 20111130; RU 2002116779 A 20040220; RU 2247003 C2 20050227; US 6619377 B1 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USINOR

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-12-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003945 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ETAY, JACQUELINE

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GARNIER, MARCEL

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DELANNOY, YVES

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GALPIN, JEAN-MARIE

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAMANT, JEAN-YVES

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GARDIN, PASCAL

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI