Global Patent Index - EP 1240094 A1

EP 1240094 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR FORMING A TRAIN OF SUSPENDED OBJECTS TRANSPORTED UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF AIR JETS, AND CONVEYING SECTION FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FORMING A TRAIN OF SUSPENDED OBJECTS TRANSPORTED UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF AIR JETS, AND CONVEYING SECTION FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES STROMES AUFGEHÄNGTER GEGENSTÄNDE IN EINER LUFTSTRAHLFÖRDERANLAGE UND SOWIE FÖRDERSTRECKE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN TRAIN D'ARTICLES SUSPENDUS TRANSPORTES SOUS L'ACTION DE JETS D'AIR ET TRONçON DE CONVOYAGE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1240094 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00985374 A

Priority

  • FR 0003352 W
  • FR 9916296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146049A1] The invention relates to a method for forming a train (T) of objects (B), such as plastic bottles, which are transported in a conveying line in a suspended state and at the same time, propelled along said line in a given direction of transportation (SDT), under the influence of transporter air jets. Said method comprises the following successive steps, which are carried out over a conveying section (2) or train-forming section: a) (phases 1 and 2) the objects are accumulated in at least one area (Z2) downstream of the train-forming section, under the influence of transporter air-jets (J) situated in an upstream area (Z1) of the section, by aeraulic slowing (and possibly, stopping) of the objects in the downstream area (Z2); b) (phase 3) stopping or decreasing the strength of the transporter air jets (J) in the upstream area (Z1) of the train-forming section in such a way that the objects present in this upstream area do not enter the downstream area; and accelerating (or starting) a train (T) of objects under the influence of transporter air jets (J, J') in the upstream area (Z2) of the train-forming section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 51/03; B65G 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/08 (2006.01); B65G 51/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/082 (2013.01); B65G 51/035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146049A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146049 A1 20010628; AU 2181401 A 20010703; EP 1240094 A1 20020918; FR 2802904 A1 20010629; FR 2802904 B1 20020503; MX PA02006211 A 20040226; US 2002192038 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR FORMING A TRAIN OF SUSPENDED OBJECTS TRANSPORTED UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF AIR JETS, AND CONVEYING SECTION FOR CA

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TRENEL, JO(L

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TRAVAIL, BRUNO

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RODRIGUES, CARLOS

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020412

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI