Global Patent Index - EP 1240108 A1

EP 1240108 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR TREATING EFFLUENTS, COMPRISING AN ADDITIONAL TREATMENT OF THE SLUDGE BY OZONISATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR TREATING EFFLUENTS, COMPRISING AN ADDITIONAL TREATMENT OF THE SLUDGE BY OZONISATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABWASSERBEHANDLUNG MIT EINER ZUSÄTZLICHEN SCHLAMMBEHANDLUNG DURCH OZON

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT D'EAUX RESIDUAIRES COMPRENANT UN TRAITEMENT ADDITIONNEL DES BOUES PAR OZONATION

Publication

EP 1240108 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00971503 A

Priority

  • FR 0002973 W
  • FR 9915427 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142150A1] The inventive method is characterized in that it comprises a stage in which the sludge from the biological treatment stage or the separation stage is degraded. During said degradation stage, the sludge is brought into contact with an ozonised gas in conditions in which it is possible to obtain a floc consisting of granules with an average size of over 200 microns and a level of volatile matter of between 50 and 65 %, the thickening factor of the granular sludge after a decantation of 30 minutes always being greater than 4. The granular sludge is obtained by: treating between 0.1 and 2, preferably between 0.1 and 1.5 times the mass of sludge present in the biological treatment stage; and applying a dose of ozone of between 3 and 100 grams ozone per kilogram suspended matter (SM) treated, preferably between 4 and 10 grams of ozone per kilo of suspended matter (SM) treated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C02F 11/06; C02F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); C02F 3/12 (2006.01); C02F 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 3/1221 (2013.01); C02F 11/06 (2013.01); Y02W 10/15 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142150A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142150 A1 20010614; AU 1034901 A 20010618; BR 0016220 A 20020910; CA 2394359 A1 20010614; CA 2394359 C 20081223; DE 1240108 T1 20030306; EP 1240108 A1 20020918; ES 2180462 T1 20030216; FR 2801880 A1 20010608; FR 2801880 B1 20020222; JP 2004501739 A 20040122; US 6780319 B1 20040824

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081114

2003-03-06 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2002-12-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2002-12-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: MECHINEAU, ANNE

2002-12-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: PUJOL, ROGER

2002-11-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2002-11-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: MECHINEAU, ANNE

2002-11-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: PUJOL, ROGER

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THIEBLIN, ERIC

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MECHINEAU, ANNE

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PUJOL, ROGER

2002-10-30 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

2002-10-23 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2002-10-09 [REG GR PP] EP - PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: GR 20020300046

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI