Global Patent Index - EP 1240124 A1

EP 1240124 A1 2002-09-18 - STABLE BISPHENOLIC COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

STABLE BISPHENOLIC COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

STABILE BISPHENOLISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS BISPHENOLIQUES STABLES

Publication

EP 1240124 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00988170 A

Priority

  • US 0034542 W
  • US 17135699 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146101A1] There is provided a stable single-phase composition of bisphenolic stillbottoms and methods for making such compositions. There is also provided a resole and a novolac composition that includes in the manufacture of the resins the use of a stable solution of bisphenolic stillbottoms. Methods for making the resins are also provided. There is further provided a low molecular weight phenolic resin useful in the manufacture of paper laminates, such that the resin exhibits improved paper saturation and reduced phenol emissions during treating when compared to the prior art. There is also provided a laminate composition that results in a paper laminate that exhibits improved flexibility when compared to the prior art.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 37/74; C08G 8/26; C08L 61/14; C09K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 37/88 (2006.01); C07C 39/16 (2006.01); C08G 8/08 (2006.01); C08G 8/10 (2006.01); C08G 8/20 (2006.01); C08G 8/24 (2006.01); C08G 8/26 (2006.01); C08G 14/08 (2006.01); C08L 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 8/08 (2013.01); C07C 37/88 (2013.01); C08G 8/10 (2013.01); C08G 8/20 (2013.01); C08G 8/24 (2013.01); C08L 61/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 37/88 + C07C 39/16

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146101 A1 20010628; WO 0146101 A9 20010920; AU 2440501 A 20010703; AU 778534 B2 20041209; CA 2392817 A1 20010628; EP 1240124 A1 20020918; EP 1240124 A4 20060510

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160701

2012-01-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOMENTIVE SPECIALTY CHEMICALS RESEARCH BELGIUM

2009-04-15 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090313

2008-10-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEXION SPECIALTY CHEMICALS RESEARCH BELGIUM S.A.

2008-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080509

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEXION SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC.

2006-05-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060328

2003-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORDEN CHEMICAL, INC.

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI