Global Patent Index - EP 1240145 A2

EP 1240145 A2 2002-09-18 - SUBSTITUTED 2-THIO-3,5-DICYANO-4-ARYL-6-AMINOPYRIDINES AND THE USE THEREOF

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED 2-THIO-3,5-DICYANO-4-ARYL-6-AMINOPYRIDINES AND THE USE THEREOF

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE 2-THIO-3,5-DICYYANO-4-ARYL-6-AMINOPYRIDINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ADENOSIN-REZEPTORLIGANDEN

Title (fr)

2-THIO-3,5-DICYANO-4-ARYL-6-AMINOPYRIDINE SUBSTITUEE ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1240145 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00967705 A

Priority

  • DE 19947154 A
  • EP 0009153 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0125210A2] The invention relates to compounds of general formula (I), a method for the production thereof and the use thereof as pharmacologically effective substances for a broad medical indication spectrum. Furthermore, selective adenosine receptor ligands, preferably selective adenosine A1-, adenosine A2a- and/or adenosine A2b-receptor ligands are provided for the prophylaxis and/or the treatment of diseases, especially cardiovascular diseases, diseases of the urogenital region, diseases of the respiratory tract, inflammatory and neuroinflammatory diseases, diabetes, especially pancreatic diabetes, neurodegenerative diseases, pain states, cancer as well as liver fibrosis and liver cirrhosis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 213/85; A61K 31/4418; A61K 31/4427; C07D 401/12; C07D 405/12; C07D 409/12; C07D 413/12; C07D 417/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4418 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/4436 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/85 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 213/85 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0125210A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0125210 A2 20010412; WO 0125210 A3 20011011; AU 775159 B2 20040722; AU 7778000 A 20010510; BG 106546 A 20030331; BR 0014679 A 20020702; CA 2386147 A1 20010412; CN 1407971 A 20030402; CU 20020064 A7 20080724; CZ 20021143 A3 20020717; CZ 301202 B6 20091209; DE 19947154 A1 20011004; EE 200200175 A 20030415; EP 1240145 A2 20020918; HR P20020375 A2 20050430; HU 0202810 A2 20021228; HU 0202810 A3 20030228; IL 148545 D0 20020912; JP 2003511371 A 20030325; KR 20070106051 A 20071031; MA 25688 A1 20030401; MX PA02003271 A 20021104; NO 20021449 A 20020507; NO 20021449 D0 20020322; NO 323848 B1 20070709; PL 353969 A1 20031215; RU 2002111569 A 20040120; RU 2267482 C2 20060110; SK 4342002 A3 20020806; UA 73957 C2 20020715; US 2006264432 A1 20061123; US 7135486 B1 20061114; US 7504421 B2 20090317; ZA 200201806 B 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120106

2011-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2009-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2009-09-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080606

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSENTRETER, ULRICH

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HENNING, ROLF

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUSER, MARCUS

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRAEMER, THOMAS

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAUPEL, ANDREA

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUEBSCH, WALTER

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEMBOWSKY, KLAUS

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SALCHER-SCHRAUFSTAETTER, OLGA

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20020502;LV PAYMENT 20020502;MK;RO PAYMENT 20020502;SI PAYMENT 20020502