Global Patent Index - EP 1240201 A1

EP 1240201 A1 2002-09-18 - OXIDIZED APOLIPOPROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

OXIDIZED APOLIPOPROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

OXIDIERTE APOLIPOPROTEINE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

APOLIPOPROTEINES OXYDEES ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1240201 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00979269 A

Priority

  • AU 0001463 W
  • AU PQ429399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138395A1] The present invention relates to oxidized forms of apolipoproteins and methods of use in diagnosis and treatment of diseases associated with oxidative stress, such as cardiovascular diseases, in particular of atherosclerosis. Specifically, oxidized forms of ApoA-1 and ApoA-II having specific methionine residues oxidized are provided. Methods of use include increasing effux and alpha -TOH, lowering lipid concentrations and preventing or treating lipid-associated conditions are provided. Methods of detecting oxidative stress, genotypes and extent of lipid associated conditions are also provided by utilizing the oxidative apolipoproteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/775; A61K 38/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/775 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/775 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138395 A1 20010531; AU PQ429399 A0 19991223; CA 2392355 A1 20010531; EP 1240201 A1 20020918; EP 1240201 A4 20040317; JP 2003514918 A 20030422; NZ 519040 A 20040227

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050308

2004-03-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/775 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI