Global Patent Index - EP 1240231 A1

EP 1240231 A1 2002-09-18 - OPTICAL DATA CARRIERS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

OPTICAL DATA CARRIERS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

OPTISCHE DATENTRÄGER UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SUPPORTS DE DONNEES OPTIQUES ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LES PRODUIRE

Publication

EP 1240231 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00969530 A

Priority

  • DE 19952849 A
  • EP 0010398 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19952849A1] The invention relates to optical data carriers that are especially resistant to blue laser light, and to a method for producing the same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 64/24; G11B 7/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/00 (2006.01); C08G 64/22 (2006.01); C08G 64/24 (2006.01); G11B 7/004 (2006.01); G11B 7/253 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/253 (2013.01); C08G 64/24 (2013.01); Y10T 428/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0132747A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19952849 A1 20010510; AU 7921400 A 20010514; BR 0015255 A 20021119; CN 1387543 A 20021225; EP 1240231 A1 20020918; JP 2003527464 A 20030916; MX PA02004398 A 20020902; US 6855390 B1 20050215; WO 0132747 A1 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040529

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER ANTWERPEN N.V.

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAESE, WILFRIED

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRUDER, FRIEDRICH-KARL

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIERINGER, THOMAS

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUEHLING, STEFFEN

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRUYNSEELS, FRANKY

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN MEIRVENNE, DIRK

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DE CLEYN, RENE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI