Global Patent Index - EP 1240257 A2

EP 1240257 A2 2002-09-18 - SURFACE TREATMENTS FOR PIGMENTS PROVIDING IMPROVED DISPERSIBILITY AND EXHIBITING BIOCIDAL ACTIVITY

Title (en)

SURFACE TREATMENTS FOR PIGMENTS PROVIDING IMPROVED DISPERSIBILITY AND EXHIBITING BIOCIDAL ACTIVITY

Title (de)

OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON PIGMENTEN ZWECKS VERBESSERUNG DER DISPERGIERBARKEIT UND VERBESSERTER BIOZIDAKTIVITÄT

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENTS DE SURFACE POUR PIGMENTS AMELIORANT LA DISPERSIBILITE ET PRESENTANT UNE ACTIVITE BIOCIDE

Publication

EP 1240257 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00988477 A

Priority

  • US 0041430 W
  • US 42670999 A
  • US 42712999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0130888A2] A composition consisting of the reaction product of a halogenated carboxylic acid, an amine, and optionally a fatty acid. The composition has biocidal properties and enhances pigment dispersibility. Also disclosed is an additive for enhancing the performance of industrial pigments. The additive improves dispersibility and is the reaction product of an amine, a fatty amine, and a polybasic acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09C 3/00; C09C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09C 1/36 (2006.01); C09C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C09C 1/3669 (2013.01); C09C 3/08 (2013.01); C01P 2004/12 (2013.01); C01P 2004/62 (2013.01); C01P 2004/64 (2013.01); C01P 2004/80 (2013.01); C01P 2004/82 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0130888 A2 20010503; WO 0130888 A3 20011220; WO 0130888 A9 20020801; AU 2468301 A 20010508; AU 782961 B2 20050915; CA 2389040 A1 20010503; EP 1240257 A2 20020918; EP 1240257 A4 20071024; MX PA02004146 A 20030820

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081111

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080430

2007-10-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070921

2002-10-16 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI