Global Patent Index - EP 1240275 A1

EP 1240275 A1 2002-09-18 - COUNTERCURRENT DESULFURIZATION PROCESS FOR REFRACTORY ORGANOSULFUR HETEROCYCLES

Title (en)

COUNTERCURRENT DESULFURIZATION PROCESS FOR REFRACTORY ORGANOSULFUR HETEROCYCLES

Title (de)

GEGENSTROMENTSCHWEFELUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR REFRAKTÄRE HETEROZYKLISCHE SCHWEFELORGANISCHE VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCESSUS DE DESULFURATION A CONTRE-COURANT POUR HETEROCYCLES ORGANOSULFUREUX REFRACTAIRES

Publication

EP 1240275 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00957843 A

Priority

  • US 0023470 W
  • US 38564499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0116256A1] A process for the hydrodesulfurization (HDS) of the multiple condensed ring heterocyclic organosulfur compounds present in petroleum and chemical streams. The stream is passed through at least one reaction zone countercurrent to the flow of a hydrogen-containing treat gas, and through at least one sorbent zone. The reaction zone contains a bed of Group VIII metal-containing hydrodesulfurization catalyst and the sorbent zone contains a bed of hydrogen sulfide sorbent material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 25/00; C10G 45/00; C10G 45/04; C10G 45/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/14 (2006.01); B01J 20/04 (2006.01); B01J 20/06 (2006.01); B01J 20/08 (2006.01); B01J 20/18 (2006.01); C10G 25/00 (2006.01); C10G 25/03 (2006.01); C10G 45/00 (2006.01); C10G 45/04 (2006.01); C10G 45/08 (2006.01); C10G 45/10 (2006.01); C10G 45/12 (2006.01); C10G 45/60 (2006.01); C10G 65/04 (2006.01); C10G 67/06 (2006.01); C10G 67/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 25/003 (2013.01); C10G 45/10 (2013.01); C10G 65/04 (2013.01); C10G 67/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0116256 A1 20010308; AU 6940500 A 20010326; CA 2382997 A1 20010308; EP 1240275 A1 20020918; EP 1240275 A4 20030528; JP 2003508580 A 20030304; NO 20020933 A 20020425; NO 20020933 D0 20020226; US 6495029 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-05-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10G 25/00 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10G 45/00 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10G 45/04 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10G 45/60 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10G 67/06 B

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI