Global Patent Index - EP 1240276 A1

EP 1240276 A1 2002-09-18 - NOVEL TRANSITION METAL PHOSPHIDE CATALYSTS

Title (en)

NOVEL TRANSITION METAL PHOSPHIDE CATALYSTS

Title (de)

NEUARTIGER ÜBERGANGSMETALLPHOSPHID KATALYSATOR

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX CATALYSEURS DE PHOSPHURES D'UN METAL DE TRANSITION

Publication

EP 1240276 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00966987 A

Priority

  • US 0026603 W
  • US 15670199 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0123501A1] There is provided a transition metal phosphide catalyst that is active for hydrotreating hydrocarbon feedstocks. The catalyst comprises a transition metal phosphide complex supported on a high surface area support. The high surface area support may be selected from the group consisting of carbon, silica, alumina, titania, thoria, magnesia, zirconia, kaolin, bentonite, kieselguhr, zeolites and combination thereof. The transition metal phosphide complex may include a mixed metal phosphide complex. The catalyst comprises a metal phosphide complex having the formula MPx, where M is selected from the group consisting of V, Cr, Mn, Fe, Co, Ni, Nb, Mo, Ta, and W, and where x is between about 0.1 and about 10; and an oxide support, where the metal phosphide complex is dispersed on the high surface area support. Further, the catalyst comprises a metal phosphide catalyst comprising a metal phosphide complex having the formula AaBbPy, where A and B are each selected from the group consisting of V, Cr, Mn, Fe, Co, Ni, Nb, Mo, Ta, and W, where the sum of a and b is 1, the ratio of a to b is between about 0.01 and about 100, and y is between about 0.1 and about 10; and an oxide support, where the metal phosphide complex is dispersed on the high surface area support. Further, there is provided a method for hydrotreating a hydrocarbon feed using a transition metal phosphide catalyst. A method for hydrodesulfurization, including deep hydrodesulfurization, using the above catalysts is also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 45/04; B01J 21/02; B01J 21/04; B01J 21/06; B01J 21/08; B01J 21/10; B01J 21/16; B01J 21/18; B01J 27/02; B01J 27/045; B01J 27/08; B01J 27/14; B01J 27/182; B01J 27/185; B01J 27/186; B01J 27/188; B01J 27/19; B01J 27/192; B01J 27/195; B01J 27/198; B01J 27/199

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 27/14 (2006.01); C10G 45/04 (2006.01); C10G 45/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 37/18 (2013.01); B01J 27/14 (2013.01); C10G 45/04 (2013.01); C10G 45/06 (2013.01); C10G 45/34 (2013.01); C10G 45/46 (2013.01); C10G 45/60 (2013.01); B01J 35/0053 (2013.01); B01J 35/1014 (2013.01); B01J 35/1019 (2013.01); B01J 37/0201 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0123501 A1 20010405; AU 7725200 A 20010430; EP 1240276 A1 20020918; EP 1240276 A4 20030702; EP 2218502 A2 20100818; EP 2218502 A3 20100922

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-01-22 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES

2009-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IFP

2009-08-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IFP

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041021

2003-07-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 21/02 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 21/04 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 21/06 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 21/08 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 21/10 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 21/16 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 21/18 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 27/02 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 27/045 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10G 45/04 B

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020423;LT PAYMENT 20020423;LV PAYMENT 20020423;MK PAYMENT 20020423;RO PAYMENT 20020423;SI PAYMENT 20020423