Global Patent Index - EP 1240287 A1

EP 1240287 A1 2002-09-18 - DETERGENT TABLETS

Title (en)

DETERGENT TABLETS

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELTABLETTEN

Title (fr)

PASTILLES DE DETERGENT

Publication

EP 1240287 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00985168 A

Priority

  • DE 19962883 A
  • EP 0012808 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148132A1] The invention relates to detergent tablets which are characterised in that they contain tenside granulates obtained by granulating and compacting non-ionic hydroxy mixed-ether-type tensides in the presence of disintegrants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/72; C11D 1/825; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/835; C11D 1/94; C11D 3/22; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 3/3726 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148132A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148132 A1 20010705; DE 19962883 A1 20010712; EP 1240287 A1 20020918; EP 1240287 B1 20040714; ES 2225284 T3 20050316; US 2003027741 A1 20030206; US 7087570 B2 20060808

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071215

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071217

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071217

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071215

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071215

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2007-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225284 T3

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007093 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEUTHEN, MANFRED

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KISCHKEL, DITMAR

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ELSNER, MICHAEL

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR