Global Patent Index - EP 1240289 A1

EP 1240289 A1 2002-09-18 - SOLID DETERGENTS

Title (en)

SOLID DETERGENTS

Title (de)

FESTE WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT SOLIDE

Publication

EP 1240289 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00990770 A

Priority

  • DE 19962859 A
  • EP 0012809 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148133A1] The invention relates to solid detergents containing hydroxy mixed-ether-type non-ionic tensides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/72; C11D 1/825; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/835; C11D 1/94; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148133A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148133 A1 20010705; DE 19962859 A1 20010712; EP 1240289 A1 20020918; US 2003022809 A1 20030130

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040315

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEUTHEN, MANFRED

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELSNER, MICHAEL

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KISCHKEL, DITMAR

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR