Global Patent Index - EP 1240290 A2

EP 1240290 A2 2002-09-18 - TENSIDE GRANULES WITH IMPROVED DISINTEGRATION RATE

Title (en)

TENSIDE GRANULES WITH IMPROVED DISINTEGRATION RATE

Title (de)

TENSIDGRANULATE MIT VERBESSERTER AUFLÖSEGESCHWINDIGKEIT

Title (fr)

GRANULATS DE TENSIOACTIFS PRESENTANT UNE PLUS GRANDE VITESSE DE DISSOLUTION

Publication

EP 1240290 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00991605 A

Priority

  • DE 19962886 A
  • EP 0012814 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148131A2] The invention relates to tenside granules with an improved disintegration rate that are obtained by granulating non-ionic tensides of the hydroxy mixed ether type in the presence of disintegrants and compacting the products obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/72; C11D 1/825; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/835; C11D 1/94; C11D 3/22; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3726 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148131A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148131 A2 20010705; WO 0148131 A3 20011122; DE 19962886 A1 20010705; EP 1240290 A2 20020918; EP 1240290 B1 20040804; ES 2225302 T3 20050316; US 2003144172 A1 20030731; US 2006079432 A1 20060413; US 7186678 B2 20070306

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-04-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225302 T3

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041115

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007325 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEUTHEN, MANFRED

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KISCHKEL, DITMAR

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ELSNER, MICHAEL

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR