Global Patent Index - EP 1240316 A2

EP 1240316 A2 2002-09-18 - RESOLVASE-CATALYSED, SEQUENCE-SPECIFIC DNA-RECOMBINATION IN EUKARYOTIC CELLS

Title (en)

RESOLVASE-CATALYSED, SEQUENCE-SPECIFIC DNA-RECOMBINATION IN EUKARYOTIC CELLS

Title (de)

RESOLVASE-KATALYSIERTE, SEQUENZ-SPEZIFISCHE DNA-REKOMBINATION IN EUKARYOTISCHEN ZELLEN

Title (fr)

RECOMBINAISON AVEC UNE SEQUENCE SPECIFIQUE D'ADN CATALYSEE PAR RESOLVASE DANS DES CELLULES EUCARYOTES

Publication

EP 1240316 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00977566 A

Priority

  • DE 19956513 A
  • EP 0011718 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138511A2] The invention relates to a method for the sequence-specific recombination of DNA in eukaryotic cells, comprising the following steps: introducing a first DNA sequence which contains a res sequence into a cell, introducing a copy of the first DNA sequence and performing the sequence-specific recombination using the influence of a resolvase or its derivative. The invention also relates to a method for testing topoisomerase inhibitors in a eukaryotic cell, comprising the following steps: introducing a first DNA sequence according to SEQ ID NO:1 into a cell, introducing a copy of the first DNA sequence according to SEQ ID NO:1 in direct orientation, introducing a wild-type resolvase and adding the topoisomerase inhibitors which are to be tested.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A01K 67/033 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/22 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/907 (2013.01); C12N 9/00 (2013.01); C12N 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0138511A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138511 A2 20010531; WO 0138511 A3 20020510; WO 0138511 A8 20020530; AU 1823901 A 20010604; CA 2394827 A1 20010531; DE 19956513 A1 20010621; EP 1240316 A2 20020918; JP 2003533176 A 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080213

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060519

2006-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELONIC GMBH

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060519

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DROEGE, PETER

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI