Global Patent Index - EP 1240318 A1

EP 1240318 A1 2002-09-18 - EMBRYONIC OR STEM-LIKE CELLS PRODUCED BY CROSS SPECIES NUCLEAR TRANSPLANTATION

Title (en)

EMBRYONIC OR STEM-LIKE CELLS PRODUCED BY CROSS SPECIES NUCLEAR TRANSPLANTATION

Title (de)

DURCH SPEZIES-ÜBERGREIFENDE, NUKLEäRE TRANSPLANTATION HERGESTELLTE EMBRYONALE ODER STAMMZELLEN-ÄHNLICHE ZELLEN

Title (fr)

CELLULES SOUCHES OU EMBRYONNAIRES PRODUITES PAR TRANSPLANTATION NUCLEAIRE HETEROSPECIFIQUE

Publication

EP 1240318 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00930498 A

Priority

  • US 0012631 W
  • US 46707699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146401A1] Method of nuclear transfer involving the transplantation of differentiated donor cell nuclei into enucleated oocytes of a species different from the donor cell, in conjunction with compatible cytoplasm and/or mitochondria (of same species as donor), are provided. The resultant nuclear transfer units are useful for the production of isogenic embryonic stem cells, in particular human isogenic embryonic or stem cells. These embryonic or stem-like cells are useful for producing desired differentiated cells and for introduction, removal or modification, of desired genes, e.g., at specific sites of the genome of such cells by homologous recombination. These cells, which may contain a heterologous gene, are especially useful in cell transplantation therapies and for in vitro study of cell differentiation. Nuclear transfer efficiency is enhanced by introduction of compatible cytoplasm or mitochondrial DNA (same species or similar to donor cell or nucleus). Also, nuclear transfer efficiency can further optionally be enhanced by genetically altering donor cells to inhibit apoptosis, by selecting for a specific cell cycle and/or by culturing under conditions that enhance embryonic growth and development.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 67/027; C12N 5/16; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/873 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/873 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146401 A1 20010628; WO 0146401 A8 20010726; AU 4830900 A 20010703; AU 784731 B2 20060608; BR 0016561 A 20020910; CA 2394614 A1 20010628; CN 1425064 A 20030618; EP 1240318 A1 20020918; EP 1240318 A4 20041208; IL 150065 A 20090922; IL 150065 D0 20021201; JP 2004500066 A 20040108; MX PA02006093 A 20040823; NZ 519346 A 20040227

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081202

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060628

2004-12-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01K 67/027 A

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 B

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/16 B

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI