Global Patent Index - EP 1240334 A2

EP 1240334 A2 2002-09-18 - CORE 1B3-GALACTOSYL TRANSFERASES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (en)

CORE 1B3-GALACTOSYL TRANSFERASES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (de)

1B3-GALACTOSYL TRANSFERASE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

$G(B)3-GALACTOSYLE TRANSFERASES DE COEUR 1 ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1240334 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00990216 A

Priority

  • US 0033945 W
  • US 46403599 A
  • US 46132199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144478A2] Core 1 beta 3-galactosyl transferases and nucleic acids encoding the core (1) beta 3-galactosyl transferases are described. The enzymes and the nucleic acids encoding said enzymes have been identified in human, rat, mouse <i>D. melanogaster</i> and <i>C. elegans</i>. The polypeptides exhibit a wide range of homologies. The polynucleotides can be used to transform or transfect host cells for producing substantially pure forms of the enzyme, or for use in an expression system for post-translational core (1) <i>O</i>-linked glycosylation of proteins or peptides produced within the expression system. The enzymes can be used to galactosylate, via a beta 3-linkage, an N-acetylgalactosamine linked to a serine, threonine or other <i>O</i>-linking amino acid on peptides or proteins requiring <i>O</i>-linked glycosylation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/54; C12N 9/10; C12P 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/54 (2006.01); C12P 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 19/18 (2013.01); C12N 9/1051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144478A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144478 A2 20010621; WO 0144478 A3 20020131; WO 0144478 A9 20020711; AU 2727301 A 20010625; CA 2396654 A1 20010621; EP 1240334 A2 20020918; JP 2003527103 A 20030916; MX PA02005953 A 20030128

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1048140

2005-07-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041228

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CANFIELD, WILLIAM, M.

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CUMMINGS, RICHARD, D.

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JU, TONGZHONG

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI