Global Patent Index - EP 1240389 A1

EP 1240389 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR MODIFYING CELLULOSE-BASED FIBER MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MODIFYING CELLULOSE-BASED FIBER MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG VON FASERSTOFF AUF CELLULOSEBASIS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION D'UNE MATIERE FIBREUSE A BASE DE CELLULOSE

Publication

EP 1240389 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00966646 A

Priority

  • SE 0001823 W
  • SE 9903418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0121890A1] A method for modifying cellulose fibers; which are treated for at least 5 minutes with an aqueous solution of CMC or CMC-derivative containing electrolyte at a temperature of at least approximately 100 DEG C, and the pH during the treatment is approximately 1.5-4.5, or higher than 11; or the concentration of electrolyte is approximately 0.001 - 0.5 M, if the electrolyte has monovalent cations, or approximately 0.0002 - 0.5 M, if the electrolyte has divalent cations, and cellulose fibers that have been modified according to this method, and use of the modified cellulose fibers for the manufacture of rayon fibers. A method for the manufacture of paper with a high wet strength, whereby an aqueous suspension of cellulose fibers is produced, and the cellulose fibers are modified as described above, and wet-strength agent is added to the aqueous suspension; and paper with a high wet strength manufactured according to this method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 11/20; D21H 17/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/00 (2006.01); D21H 11/20 (2006.01); D21H 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/005 (2013.01); D21H 11/20 (2013.01); D21H 21/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0121890A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0121890 A1 20010329; AT 470011 T 20100615; AU 7696000 A 20010424; DE 60044504 D1 20100715; EP 1240389 A1 20020918; EP 1240389 B1 20100602; ES 2346634 T3 20101019; SE 9903418 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100920

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100920

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100920

2011-06-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60044504

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100920

2011-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110303

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-04-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101004

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100602

2010-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100602

2010-12-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100903

2010-10-19 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2346634 T3

2010-09-22 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100602

2010-08-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60044504 P 20100715

2010-07-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080307

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI