Global Patent Index - EP 1240401 A1

EP 1240401 A1 2002-09-18 - Security device which is compatible with various electronic product monitoring systems

Title (en)

Security device which is compatible with various electronic product monitoring systems

Title (de)

Zu verschiedenen elektronischen Artikel-Überwachungssystemen kompatibele Sicherungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité compatible avec différents systèmes électroniques de surveillance d'articles

Publication

EP 1240401 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00990739 A

Priority

  • DE 19963130 A
  • EP 0012680 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19963130A1] The security unit (1) has a casing (5) containing a device (19,21) to transmit a characteristic signal and a fixing element (9) that can be releasable connected to the casing. The article (3) to be tagged is arranged between the casing and the fixing element, or is enclosed by it. The device to transmit the signal can be removed from the casing or may be arranged between the casing and the fixing element. Independent claims are included for the use of a conventional 'hard tag' in the security unit and for a method to tag articles using the security unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/0017 (2013.01); E05B 73/0005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148343A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19963130 A1 20010628; AU 3010901 A 20010709; AU 773478 B2 20040527; EP 1240401 A1 20020918; US 2003020613 A1 20030130; US 2004239506 A1 20041202; WO 0148343 A1 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050826

2004-12-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SECURITY DEVICE WHICH IS COMPATIBLE WITH VARIOUS ELECTRONIC PRODUCT MONITORING SYSTEMS

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHECKPOINT SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI