Global Patent Index - EP 1240405 A1

EP 1240405 A1 2002-09-18 - DRILL STRING WITH INTERFERENCE FIT COUPLINGS AND COUPLERS THEREFOR

Title (en)

DRILL STRING WITH INTERFERENCE FIT COUPLINGS AND COUPLERS THEREFOR

Title (de)

BOHRSTRANG MIT PRESSSITZVERBINDUNGEN UND DAFÜR GEEIGNETES VERBINDUNGSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

TRAIN DE TIGES DE FORAGE COMPORTANT DES COUPLAGES AVEC AJUSTEMENT SERRE, ET DISPOSITIFS DE COUPLAGE DESTINES A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 1240405 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00971186 A

Priority

  • CA 0001255 W
  • CA 2287681 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0131162A1] A threaded end of a drill rod is formed from a sleeve to one end of the body. The sleeve has a threaded bore to receive a threaded end of an adjacent component and is secured to the body of the rod by an interference fit between a bore and spigot on the two components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/042; E21B 17/03; E21B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/04 (2006.01); E21B 17/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/04 (2013.01); E21B 17/0426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0131162A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0131162 A1 20010503; AU 1013801 A 20010508; CA 2287681 A1 20010428; EP 1240405 A1 20020918; ZA 200203259 B 20030424

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040918

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB SE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI