Global Patent Index - EP 1240408 A1

EP 1240408 A1 2002-09-18 - SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING DE-WATERED OIL

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING DE-WATERED OIL

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM ABBAU VON ENTWÄSSERTEM ERDÖL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DESTINE A PRODUIRE DU PETROLE DESHYDRATE

Publication

EP 1240408 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00987412 A

Priority

  • EP 00987412 A
  • EP 0012862 W
  • EP 99204300 A
  • EP 00305704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144620A1] System for producing de-watered oil from an underground formation (2) to the surface (4), which system comprises a reception well (7) having a substantially horizontal or inclined section (10) for primary oil/water separation of the well fluid; a water discharge system (12) having an upstream end (13) that is capable of receiving during normal operation liquid from the lower region (14) of the downstream part (9) of the reception well (7); and a secondary underground oil/water separator (18) having an upstream end (19) that is capable of receiving during normal operation liquid from the upper region (20) of the downstream part (9) of the reception well (7), the secondary separator having an outlet (21) for de-watered oil that is in fluid communication with the inlet (5) of a production well and an outlet (22) for a water-enriched component that is in fluid communication with the water discharge system (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/38; E21B 43/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 41/00 (2006.01); E21B 43/30 (2006.01); E21B 43/38 (2006.01); E21B 43/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/385 (2013.01); E21B 41/0035 (2013.01); E21B 43/305 (2013.01); E21B 43/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144620A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144620 A1 20010621; AU 2366301 A 20010625; AU 767553 B2 20031113; BR 0016375 A 20020827; CA 2393406 A1 20010621; CA 2393406 C 20081125; CN 1246567 C 20060322; CN 1409799 A 20030409; DE 60014432 D1 20041104; EA 003315 B1 20030424; EA 200200669 A1 20021226; EP 1240408 A1 20020918; EP 1240408 B1 20040929; MX PA02005652 A 20021023; NO 20022812 A 20020613; NO 20022812 D0 20020613; OA 12123 A 20060505

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-12-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041230

2004-12-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014432 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IT NL

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI