Global Patent Index - EP 1240423 A1

EP 1240423 A1 2002-09-18 - PISTON ENGINE

Title (en)

PISTON ENGINE

Title (de)

KOLBENMOTOR

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A PISTON

Publication

EP 1240423 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00991771 A

Priority

  • DE 0004579 W
  • DE 19962987 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148368A1] The invention relates to a piston engine comprising an engine block that contains several cylinders. The inventive piston engine also comprises a fresh-gas supply device that is provided with several supply pipes (1) which are arranged on the cylinders and are fixed to the engine block. Said piston engine further comprises a fuel injection system that is provided with a high-pressure supply line (5) which is allocated to the cylinders. The aim of the invention is to fix the supply pipes (1) and the high-pressure supply line (5) to the engine block in a simpler manner. Holding-down clamps (7) for the supply pipes (1) are configured on the high-pressure supply line (5) in such a way that the high-pressure supply line (5) fixes the supply pipes (1) to the engine block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/00; F02M 55/02; F02M 63/02; F02M 69/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/104 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01); F02B 75/20 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10085 (2013.01); F02M 35/10216 (2013.01); F02M 35/10255 (2013.01); F02M 35/10347 (2013.01); F02M 35/112 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 69/465 (2013.01); F02B 75/20 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1832 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148368A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148368 A1 20010705; DE 19962987 A1 20010705; EP 1240423 A1 20020918; EP 1240423 B1 20040303; JP 2003518582 A 20030610; JP 4571770 B2 20101027; US 2003106525 A1 20030612; US 6619256 B2 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005560

2016-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005560 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR