Global Patent Index - EP 1240424 A1

EP 1240424 A1 2002-09-18 - STROKE-CONTROLLED VALVE AS A FUEL METERING DEVICE OF AN INJECTION SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

STROKE-CONTROLLED VALVE AS A FUEL METERING DEVICE OF AN INJECTION SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

HUBGESTEUERTES VENTIL ALS KRAFTSTOFF-ZUMESSEINRICHTUNG EINES EINSPRITZSYSTEMS FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE A LEVEE COMMANDEE UTILISEE COMME DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE DE CARBURANT D'UN SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1240424 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01998729 A

Priority

  • DE 0104306 W
  • DE 10059424 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0244548A1] The invention relates to a stroke-controlled valve which is used as a fuel metering device of an injection system for internal combustion engines. Said valve has a valve needle (11) which can be actuated axially against the resistance of a spring (24), which is arranged in a graduated, coaxial recess (13) in a valve body (10) and which interacts with a valve seat (17) which is configured in the recess (13) of the valve body (10), hereby controlling the fuel injection process. The valve also comprises a high-pressure area (18) which is connected to an allocated injection nozzle and which is located in front of the valve seat (17), a low-pressure area (28) which is located behind the valve seat and which opens out into the fuel return passage (30); and a low-pressure compensating piston (22) which coaxially adjoins the valve (16, 17) and which is solidly connected to the valve needle. The invention is characterised in that a first control edge (39 or 42) is configured on the low-pressure compensating piston (22). Said control edge interacts with a second control edge (40 or 43) on the valve body recess (13) in the area of the fuel return passage (45, 30) or (48, 30) in such a way that a throttle cross-section (38, 38a or 46, 44a) that is dependent on the valve stroke (41) is formed between the two control edges (39, 40 or 42, 43).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46; F02M 41/14; F02M 53/00; F02M 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 53/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/20 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0045 (2013.01); F02M 59/205 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 59/466 (2013.01); F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 63/0017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0244548A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0244548 A1 20020606; DE 10059424 A1 20020606; EP 1240424 A1 20020918; EP 1240424 B1 20041020; JP 2004514831 A 20040520; JP 4146227 B2 20080910; US 2003136385 A1 20030724; US 6802300 B2 20041012

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081116

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081116

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081116

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050207

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104200 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030630

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR