Global Patent Index - EP 1240446 A1

EP 1240446 A1 2002-09-18 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR AN AUTOMATICALLY AND MANUALLY SHIFTABLE GEARBOX IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR AN AUTOMATICALLY AND MANUALLY SHIFTABLE GEARBOX IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

STEUEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN AUTOMATISCH UND MANUELL SCHALTBARES SCHALTGETRIEBE IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

UNITE DE COMMANDE POUR UNE BOITE DE VITESSES POUVANT ETRE UTILISEE DE MANIERE AUTOMATIQUE ET MANUELLE, INSTALLEE DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1240446 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00981341 A

Priority

  • DE 19959616 A
  • EP 0012241 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142686A1] The invention relates to a control device (1) for an automatically and manually shiftable gearbox in a motor vehicle. The inventive control device comprises a selector lever (2) for adjusting at least the forward position (D), neutral (N), reverse (R), parking position (P) and a position (M) for manual shifting. A first and a second tip switch (3a, 3c) can be actuated in the position (M) for manual shifting. Signals for manually shifting up or down with regard to the gear ratio are supplied to a control device (7) for controlling the gearbox by means of position sensors (5) and control lines (6). Failure of the position sensors (5) and/or the control lines (6) that are allocated to said sensors can be detected. The control device is improved by configuring said control device (1), with regard to shifting, in such a way that all the position sensors (5) can be checked and the failure of a position sensor (5) and/or a control line (6) can be detected at least in the parking position (P) or reverse (R) position of the selector lever (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 59/02; F16H 61/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 59/02 (2006.01); F16H 61/12 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 61/12 (2013.01); F16H 59/0204 (2013.01); F16H 2059/0239 (2013.01); F16H 2061/1208 (2013.01); F16H 2061/1284 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142686A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142686 A1 20010614; AU 1861901 A 20010618; CN 1242191 C 20060215; CN 1434906 A 20030806; DE 19959616 A1 20010613; EP 1240446 A1 20020918; EP 1240446 B1 20031217; JP 2003524120 A 20030812; US 2003056613 A1 20030327; US 6773369 B2 20040810

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151206

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151206

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111206

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031217

2004-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004827 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI