Global Patent Index - EP 1240461 A1

EP 1240461 A1 2002-09-18 - SHEATHED ELEMENT HEATER PLUG

Title (en)

SHEATHED ELEMENT HEATER PLUG

Title (de)

GLÜHSTIFTKERZE

Title (fr)

BOUGIE DE PRECHAUFFAGE

Publication

EP 1240461 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00987035 A

Priority

  • DE 0003800 W
  • DE 19959768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142714A1] The invention relates to a sheathed element heater plug for igniting a thermal combustion process and especially for starting a self-igniting combustion engine. The inventive sheathed element heater plug comprises a housing that can be sealingly arranged in a wall of a combustion chamber and receives a ceramic heater plug which protrudes into the combustion chamber and forms a heat conductor that can be connected to a voltage source and is provided with an electric resistor. An electroconductive cross-section of the heat conductor is smaller in the area of a tip of the heater plug than an electroconductive cross-section in the area of a heater plug body. According to the invention, the tip (38) of the heater plug comprises at least one truncated section (46, 50, 52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142714A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142714 A1 20010614; DE 19959768 A1 20010613; EP 1240461 A1 20020918; EP 1240461 B1 20040915; ES 2226966 T3 20050401; JP 2003516512 A 20030513; US 6849829 B1 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-09 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2010-09-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100615

2010-09-08 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100615

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226966 T3

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-11-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007813 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE