Global Patent Index - EP 1240462 A2

EP 1240462 A2 2002-09-18 - SHEATHED ELEMENT HEATER PLUG

Title (en)

SHEATHED ELEMENT HEATER PLUG

Title (de)

GLÜHSTIFTKERZE

Title (fr)

BOUGIE CRAYON DE PRECHAUFFAGE

Publication

EP 1240462 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00987092 A

Priority

  • DE 0003898 W
  • DE 19959766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142715A2] The invention relates to a sheathed element heater plug, especially for starting a self-igniting combustion engine. The inventive sheathed element heater plug comprises a heater plug that engages in a combustion chamber which is provided with a combustible mixture consisting of fuel and air. Said heater plug comprises electroconductive ceramics and can be heated to an ignition temperature by connecting to a voltage source. According to the invention, the sheathed element heater plug (10) comprises an integrated temperature sensor (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142715A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142715 A2 20010614; WO 0142715 A3 20011025; AT 284008 T 20041215; CZ 20021965 A3 20030212; DE 19959766 A1 20010613; EP 1240462 A2 20020918; EP 1240462 B1 20041201; ES 2232517 T3 20050601; HU 0203467 A2 20030228; HU 224475 B1 20050928; JP 2003527553 A 20030916; PL 195122 B1 20070831; PL 355568 A1 20040504; SK 8242002 A3 20030304; TW 575723 B 20040211; US 6812432 B1 20041102

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101109

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101108

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101108

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101108

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-20 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20080527

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ROBERT *BOSCH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061109

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-11-08 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-10-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-10-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232517 T3

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008870 P 20050105

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040219

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HALUSCHKA, CHRISTOPH

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ARNOLD, JUERGEN

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEIN, VERA

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BACH, RAINER

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HRASTNIK, KLAUS

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KERN, CHRISTOPH

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20020711