Global Patent Index - EP 1240474 A1

EP 1240474 A1 2002-09-18 - PROJECTILE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROJECTILE

Title (en)

PROJECTILE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROJECTILE

Title (de)

GESCHOSS UND VERFAHREN ZUR FERTIGUNG EINES GESCHOSSES

Title (fr)

PROJECTILE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN PROJECTILE

Publication

EP 1240474 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00979324 A

Priority

  • EP 00979324 A
  • CH 0000669 W
  • EP 99811177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111329A1] The projectile has a body (1) and guiding devices (2) radially extending from it for guiding it in a firearm barrel. At least one guiding device comprising carbon fiber compound material. A guide band (5) supporting the guiding device contains mats of crossed-over woven fibers (9). The fibers in the mat are inclined at 45 degrees to the longitudinal axis of elongated raised formations (4) of the guide device. The fiber compound material contains friction-reducing additive material, such as polytetrafluorethylene and/or molybdenum. Particularly its raised formations contain gas-forming additives.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146640A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111329 A1 20010627; AU 1686501 A 20010703; DE 50003951 D1 20031106; EP 1240474 A1 20020918; EP 1240474 B1 20031001; WO 0146640 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003951 P 20031106

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RUAG COMPONENTS

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI