Global Patent Index - EP 1240475 A1

EP 1240475 A1 2002-09-18 - PROJECTILE BODY AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING RADIALLY PROTRUDING DRIVING MEANS

Title (en)

PROJECTILE BODY AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING RADIALLY PROTRUDING DRIVING MEANS

Title (de)

GESCHOSSKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON RADIAL ABSTEHENDEN FÜHRUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

CORPS D'OBUS, ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE MOYENS DE GUIDAGE FAISANT SAILLIE RADIALEMENT

Publication

EP 1240475 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00982808 A

Priority

  • EP 00982808 A
  • CH 0000676 W
  • EP 99811175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111327A1] The projectile has a body (1) on which radially projecting guide devices (2,3) are arranged for guiding the projectile in a firing barrel. At least the radial outer area of the guide devices contains Nickel. The material of the basic body (5) is tempered steel 42 chromium molybdenum 4 or maraging steel. Nickel is applied to the basic body by an application welding process, after which the basic body is exposed to a protective gas atmosphere for one to three hours at a preferred temperature of 815 degrees Celsius or for three to six hours at a temperature of 480 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146641A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111327 A1 20010627; AU 1979701 A 20010703; DE 50005561 D1 20040408; EP 1240475 A1 20020918; EP 1240475 B1 20040303; ES 2215766 T3 20041016; NO 20022941 A 20020620; NO 20022941 D0 20020619; NO 323281 B1 20070226; WO 0146641 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091221

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110308

2011-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110309

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091220

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091220

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215766 T3

2004-08-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005561 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB LI

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RUAG COMPONENTS

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI