Global Patent Index - EP 1240496 A1

EP 1240496 A1 2002-09-18 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING, BY DIFFRACTION, THE SIZE OF SUBSTANTIALLY SPHERICAL PARTICLES, IN PARTICULAR OPAQUE DROPS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MEASURING, BY DIFFRACTION, THE SIZE OF SUBSTANTIALLY SPHERICAL PARTICLES, IN PARTICULAR OPAQUE DROPS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DURCH BEUGUNG DER GRÖSSE VON IM WESENTLICHEN SPHÄRISCHEN TEILCHEN, INSBESONDERE UNDURCHSICHTIGEN TROPFEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MESURE, PAR DIFFRACTION, DE TAILLES DE PARTICULES SENSIBLEMENT SPHERIQUES, NOTAMMENT DE GOUTTES OPAQUES

Publication

EP 1240496 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00985341 A

Priority

  • FR 0003318 W
  • FR 9914992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140766A1] The invention concerns a device for measuring, by diffraction, the size of substantially spherical particles, in particular opaque drops. Said device comprises means (46, 49, 50, 51) for receiving light diffracted by the particles (12) illuminated with a light beam, for separating said diffracted light into concentric annular zones and concentrating the parts of diffracted light, corresponding to said zones, into points (24, 26, 28) different from one another. Levels of luminous intensity are detected corresponding to said points and the size of the particles are determined on the basis of said levels of luminous intensity. The angular pattern of the concentric zones is selected in accordance with a distribution optimising the discrimination between the dimensions of the drops.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/08 (2006.01); G01N 15/02 (2006.01); G01N 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 15/0211 (2013.01); G01N 2021/4716 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140766A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140766 A1 20010607; EP 1240496 A1 20020918; FR 2801671 A1 20010601; FR 2801671 B1 20011221; JP 2003515738 A 20030507; US 6850324 B1 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI