Global Patent Index - EP 1240570 A2

EP 1240570 A2 2002-09-18 - CAPABILITY-BASED ACCESS CONTROL FOR APPLICATIONS IN PARTICULAR CO-OPERATING APPLICATIONS IN A CHIP CARD

Title (en)

CAPABILITY-BASED ACCESS CONTROL FOR APPLICATIONS IN PARTICULAR CO-OPERATING APPLICATIONS IN A CHIP CARD

Title (de)

ZUGRIFFSSTEUERUNG FÜR IN EINER CHIPKARTE ZUSAMMENWIRKENDEN ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

CONTROLE D'ACCES POUR DES APPLICATIONS COOPERANTES DANS UNE CARTE A PUCE

Publication

EP 1240570 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00990048 A

Priority

  • FR 0003463 W
  • FR 9915791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142887A2] The invention concerns an application programmer no longer responsible for managing access rights, the application code being independent of the protection in the chip card. The capability-based access control consists, when an application (Aa), for example in a docking station, is given access to an object (Ob1) pertaining to the other application (Ab) in a chip card (CP), in creating two capabilities (Fa(Ob1), Fb(Ob1)) respectively in the applications, as objects, to protect all subsequent accesses to the object by filtering them through the two capabilities. On accessing (E1) an object (Ob1) pertaining to an application (Ab), if a second object (Ob2) pertaining to the other application (Ab) is passed on to the latter, two other capabilities (Fa(Ob2, Fb(Ob2)) are added (E2) in the applications to protect access to the second object.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/62 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/6218 (2013.01); G06F 2221/2141 (2013.01); G06F 2221/2153 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142887A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142887 A2 20010614; WO 0142887 A3 20020207; AU 2685701 A 20010618; EP 1240570 A2 20020918; FR 2802319 A1 20010615; FR 2802319 B1 20041001; US 2003065982 A1 20030403; US 7490333 B2 20090210

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101209

2009-09-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI