Global Patent Index - EP 1240573 A2

EP 1240573 A2 2002-09-18 - TIMESHARED ELECTRONIC CATALOG SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (en)

TIMESHARED ELECTRONIC CATALOG SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (de)

ZEITGETEILTES ELEKTRONISCHES KATALOGSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CATALOGUES ELECTRONIQUES A TEMPS PARTAGE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1240573 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00992685 A

Priority

  • US 0042712 W
  • US 17028399 P
  • US 57726800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142882A2] A system and method for providing a timeshared electronic catalog is disclosed. The system comprises an electronic database having a plurality of data records that comprise a master data set. The system comprises at least a first and second subset of the data records, wherein each subset comprises one or more data records selected from the master data set. The system includes a software program comprising a data record masking module for selectively providing a first view for displaying one of the subsets to a first user. Each of the plurality of data records contains a plurality of data elements, or fields, or attributes. The data record masking module is further for selecting which data elements are provided in the view. The system further includes a means for selectively providing which executable features from a plurality of executable features may be provided with each view.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 30/02 (2012.01); G06Q 30/06 (2012.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/3089 (2013.01); G06F 17/30392 (2013.01); G06F 17/30398 (2013.01); G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0621 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99933 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99943 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142882 A2 20010614; WO 0142882 A3 20011220; AT 512396 T 20110615; AU 4522001 A 20010618; CA 2391829 A1 20010614; CA 2391829 C 20110208; EP 1240573 A2 20020918; EP 1240573 A4 20071010; EP 1240573 B1 20110608; IL 150064 D0 20021201; JP 2003532949 A 20031105; JP 5254515 B2 20130807; US 2005125310 A1 20050609; US 7103605 B1 20060905; US 7356492 B2 20080408

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAP SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAP AG, 69190 WALLDORF, DE

- Document: DE 60046053

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAP SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: A2I, INC., LOS ANGELES, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 60046053

- Effective date: 20110512

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60046053

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20141210

2014-12-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60046053

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111205

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111205

2012-09-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60046053

- Effective date: 20120309

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2012-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120309

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111010

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110909

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110919

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-09-28 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-07-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60046053

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-07-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2011-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-12-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAP AG

2008-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080104

2007-10-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070911

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAZI, ARIEL

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEINBERG, PAUL, N.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ARAZI, MATAN

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SULLIVAN, DAVE, L.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TINARI, PHILIP, A.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BROOKLER, DAVID, E.

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI