Global Patent Index - EP 1240596 A2

EP 1240596 A2 2002-09-18 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR STORING AND RETRIEVING KNOWLEDGE

Title (en)

METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR STORING AND RETRIEVING KNOWLEDGE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM SPEICHERN UND WIEDERAUFFINDEN VON WISSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE STOCKER ET DE RECUPERER DES CONNAISSANCES

Publication

EP 1240596 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00980758 A

Priority

  • US 0032252 W
  • US 16709299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139025A2] Apparatus for storing and retrieving knowledge includes a natural language parser, a knowledge research agent, and a directional (compass) search agent. Methods for storing and retrieving knowledge can include directional searching which combines a query text with a relationship to search, and automated knowledge model construction based upon contents of an existing knowledge model and external information searches.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/27 (2006.01); G06N 5/02 (2006.01); G06N 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/2705 (2013.01); G06F 17/271 (2013.01); G06F 17/2775 (2013.01); G06N 5/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0139025A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139025 A2 20010531; WO 0139025 A3 20020110; AU 1797801 A 20010604; CA 2392539 A1 20010531; EP 1240596 A2 20020918; JP 2003515815 A 20030507

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071212

2007-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYPERKNOWLEDGE MANAGEMENT SERVICES AG

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAVIES, TREVOR BRYAN

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANLON, MARK D.

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TROMANS, CHRISTOPHER R.

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050107

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAVIES, TREVOR BRYAN

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAVIES, TREVOR BRYAN

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI