Global Patent Index - EP 1240605 A1

EP 1240605 A1 2002-09-18 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AND DISPLAYING WEB-BASED PRODUCT OFFERINGS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AND DISPLAYING WEB-BASED PRODUCT OFFERINGS

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ORTEN UND ANZEIGEN VON INTERNETBASIERTEN PRODUKTANGEBOTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA LOCALISATION ET LA PRESENTATION D'OFFRES DE PRODUITS ACCESSIBLES SUR INTERNET

Publication

EP 1240605 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00992854 A

Priority

  • US 0042645 W
  • US 16957099 P
  • US 52812700 A
  • US 52813800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146870A1] A search engine system (130) displays the results of a multiple-category search according to levels of relevance of the categories to a user's search query. A query server (140) receives a search query (620) from a user (110) and identifies, within each of multiple item categories, a set of items that satisfy the query (640). The sets of items are then used to generate, for each of the multiple categories, a score that indicates a level significance or relevance of the category to the search (650). The scores may be based, for example, on the number of hits (items satisfying the query) within each category relative to the total number of items in that category, the popularity levels of items (756) that satisfy the query, or a combination thereof. The categories are then presented to the user, together with the most relevant items within each category, in the order of highest to lowest category relevance (660). The search engine also implements a feature for assisting users in locating web pages from which user-specified products can be purchased. Web pages (167) located by a crawler program (160) are scored, based on a set of rules, according to likelihood of including an online product offering (170). A query server (140) accesses an index (147) of the scored web pages to locate pages that are both responsive to a user's search query and likely to include a product offering. In one embodiment, the responsive web pages are listed on a composite search results page (300) together with products that satisfy the query.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 13/00; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06F 17/30864 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146870 A1 20010628; AU 4712601 A 20010703; EP 1240605 A1 20020918; EP 1240605 A4 20060927

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: A9.COM, INC.

2012-06-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120514

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070522

2006-09-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060830

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI