Global Patent Index - EP 1240610 A1

EP 1240610 A1 2002-09-18 - TRANSACTION PROCESSING USING INTERMEDIATE SERVER ARCHITECTURE

Title (en)

TRANSACTION PROCESSING USING INTERMEDIATE SERVER ARCHITECTURE

Title (de)

VERARBEITUNG VON TRANSAKTIONEN MIT EINER INTERMEDIÄRE SERVER-ARCHITEKTUR

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTIONS UTILISANT UNE ARCHITECTURE DE SERVEURS INTERMEDIAIRES

Publication

EP 1240610 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00982148 A

Priority

  • US 0031656 W
  • US 16755299 P
  • US 49589800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139072A1] A transaction processing network that includes multiple transaction terminals having a wireless data communication device, a server, a first network linking the multiple transaction terminals to the server and a second network linking the server to multiple destinations. A first and second protocol are used for the first and second network, respectively, wherein the first protocol has lower overhead than the second protocol. The method of transaction processing by using the transaction processing network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/00 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06Q 20/02 (2013.01); G06Q 20/32 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/425 (2013.01); G07F 7/0886 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139072 A1 20010531; AU 1921501 A 20010604; CA 2392391 A1 20010531; EP 1240610 A1 20020918; EP 1240610 A4 20060322; MX PA02005228 A 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRANSACTION NETWORK SERVICES, INC.

2006-03-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 19/00 20060101AFI20060201BHEP

2006-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 7/08 20060101ALI20060201BHEP

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STAMBAUGH, ROD

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI