Global Patent Index - EP 1240640 A1

EP 1240640 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF DRAWN SEALS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF DRAWN SEALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DURCHZIEHPLOMBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES FERMETURES DE SECURITE A LANGUETTE TRAVERSANTE

Publication

EP 1240640 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99959165 A

Priority

CH 9900618 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146936A1] The tongue material (2) is shaped, in a hot state, immediately after the extrusion thereof, preferably by means of a gear wheel acting upon the tongue material. The tongue material (4) is preferably longitudinally drawn after cooling below the solidification point thereof, with preferably a doubling in length. The final tongue profile (7) is thus achieved which displays a higher stiffness due to the stretching and may be adjusted to length or cut to length. The tongue (7), produced in the above manner, is finally mounted on the base body (8) of the drawn seal (1) by a spray application and forms the final drawn seal (1), together with the sealing body, also preferably mounted to the base body (8) by a spray application. The above is characterised not only by the good stability, but by the adjustable length of the tongue (7) and also a high security on manipulation. The final drawn seal (1) can not be cut and resealed after installation, without leaving traces on the object to be sealed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/03; B29C 45/14; B29C 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146936A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146936 A1 20010628; AU 1646100 A 20010703; EP 1240640 A1 20020918; EP 1240640 B1 20030604; US 6936207 B1 20050830

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121221

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121221

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI