Global Patent Index - EP 1240652 A1

EP 1240652 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ROD-SHAPED PERMANENT MAGNETS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING ROD-SHAPED PERMANENT MAGNETS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG STABFÖRMIGER DAUERMAGNETE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'AIMANTS PERMANENTS EN FORME DE BARRES

Publication

EP 1240652 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00985202 A

Priority

  • DE 19962232 A
  • EP 0012958 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146969A1] The invention relates to a method for producing rod-shaped permanent magnets according to which pressed parts (2) are produced that are then assembled to a rod-shaped green product. Said green product is subsequently sintered, whereby a rod-shaped single-piece permanent magnet (1) is produced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/02; B22F 7/06; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/07 (2006.01); B22F 7/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/10 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01); H01F 1/08 (2006.01); H01F 7/02 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 7/062 (2013.01); H01F 7/021 (2013.01); H01F 41/0253 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49012 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49075 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/1035 + C22C 1/0441

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146969A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK FI GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146969 A1 20010628; DE 19962232 A1 20010712; DE 19962232 B4 20060504; EP 1240652 A1 20020918; EP 1240652 B1 20040317; JP 2003518331 A 20030603; US 2003110617 A1 20030619; US 6926777 B2 20050809

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081219

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005736 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING ROD-SHAPED PERMANENT MAGNETS

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR