Global Patent Index - EP 1240670 A1

EP 1240670 A1 2002-09-18 - NON-VOLATILE NOR SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PROGRAMMING THEREOF

Title (en)

NON-VOLATILE NOR SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PROGRAMMING THEREOF

Title (de)

NICHTFLÜCHTIGE NOR-HALBLEITERSPEICHEREINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN PROGRAMMIERUNG

Title (fr)

MEMOIRE NON-OU A SEMICONDUCTEURS NON VOLATILE ET PROCEDE POUR PROGRAMMER CETTE DERNIERE

Publication

EP 1240670 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99968315 A

Priority

DE 9904042 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147019A1] The invention relates to a non-volatile NOR semiconductor memory device and method for the programming thereof, whereby a number of single transistor memory cells (SZ), arranged in the form of a matrix, may be controlled by either word lines (WL) or by bit lines (BL). Each single transistor memory cell (SZ), thus possesses both a source line (S1, S2) and a drain line (D1, D2), by means of which a selective control of the respective source and drain regions (D, S) is achieved. The leak current can thus be optimally reduced in the semiconductor memory device with minimal space requirement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 27/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 16/04 (2006.01); H01L 27/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/11519 (2013.01); G11C 16/0416 (2013.01); H01L 27/11521 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147019A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147019 A1 20010628; EP 1240670 A1 20020918; US 2003007386 A1 20030109; US 6654281 B2 20031125

INPADOC legal status


2017-12-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170701

2010-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050620

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STEIN VON KAMIENSKI, ELARD

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAWER, PETER

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUDWIG, CHRISTOPH

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUTTER, CHRISTOPH

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GEORGAKOS, GEORG

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIEBELT, ANDREAS

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRIZ, JAKOB

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUCKELS, KAI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020429

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE