Global Patent Index - EP 1240671 A1

EP 1240671 A1 2002-09-18 - RETROGRADE DOPED BURIED LAYER TRANSISTOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

RETROGRADE DOPED BURIED LAYER TRANSISTOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

RETROGRAD DOTIERTER SUBKOLLEKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SOUS-COLLECTEUR DOPE RETROGRADE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1240671 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00985076 A

Priority

  • DE 19957113 A
  • EP 0011591 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139274A1] The invention relates to a method for producing an active transistor area on a substrate in bipolar technology. Said method comprises the following steps: providing a substrate (12); producing a buried doping area (9) in said substrate; producing an epitaxy layer (13); producing a retrograde doping profile (3') in said epitaxy layer, in such a way that the highly doped area of the buried doping area is enlarged in the direction of the substrate surface. The invention also relates to an active transistor area with a retrograde doping area (14) in bipolar technology.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 29/737; H01L 29/732

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/265 (2006.01); H01L 21/331 (2006.01); H01L 29/08 (2006.01); H01L 29/732 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/66272 (2013.01); H01L 29/0821 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0139274A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139274 A1 20010531; DE 19957113 A1 20010607; EP 1240671 A1 20020918; JP 2003515932 A 20030507; US 6806152 B1 20041019

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100629

2010-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080128

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI