Global Patent Index - EP 1240690 A2

EP 1240690 A2 2002-09-18 - TELEPHONE ADAPTER

Title (en)

TELEPHONE ADAPTER

Title (de)

TELEFONADAPTER

Title (fr)

ADAPTATEUR TELEPHONIQUE

Publication

EP 1240690 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00985577 A

Priority

  • GB 0004822 W
  • GB 9929821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145209A2] A telephone adapter (10, 20) for use with a telephone plug (21) having at least one male member (25) and a telephone socket (23), the plug and socket, so that a telephone plug (21) can be mounted in a telephone socket (23) with the adapter (10, 20) therebetween, the at least one male member (25) of the telephone plug (21) passing through the at least one hole (3) of the adapter into the telephone socket to support the telephone adapter and to connect the telephone plug (27) or socket (5) of the second standard to the socket of the first standard via the interconnections, the contacts and the male member of the plug.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/06; H01R 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/06 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/06 (2013.01); H04M 1/0293 (2013.01); H01R 24/62 (2013.01); H01R 2107/00 (2013.01); H01R 2201/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145209A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145209 A2 20010621; WO 0145209 A3 20011227; AU 2198701 A 20010625; AU 766986 B2 20031030; CN 1423852 A 20030611; EP 1240690 A2 20020918; GB 9929821 D0 20000209; NZ 519620 A 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-25 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1045407

2007-03-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DREWNICKI, RICHARD

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMTEL (UK) LIMITED

2005-04-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DREWNICKI, RIHARD

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI