Global Patent Index - EP 1240717 A2

EP 1240717 A2 2002-09-18 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AND EXCHANGING DATA FOR MULTIMEDIAL APPLIANCES AND AN APPLIANCE SUITABLE THEREFOR

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AND EXCHANGING DATA FOR MULTIMEDIAL APPLIANCES AND AN APPLIANCE SUITABLE THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG UND ZUM AUSTAUSCH VON DATEN FÜR MULTIMEDIALE GERÄTE SOWIE DAFÜR GEEIGNETES GERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMANDE ET D'ECHANGE DE DONNEES POUR APPAREILS MULTIMEDIA, ET APPAREIL ADAPTE A CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1240717 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00987353 A

Priority

  • DE 19961644 A
  • EP 0012257 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147129A2] The present invention relates to a method and a system for controlling and/or exchanging data for multimedial appliances and an appliance suitable therefor. According to prior art, methods and systems for controlling and exchanging data for multimedial appliances have the disadvantage that said methods, systems and appliances are very simple with regard to the requirements and the possibilities at hand and involve considerable hardware requirements. The invention is based upon the fact that each appliance which is integrated into the system sends a message at regular intervals and by means of the bus as soon as said appliance has been activated. The type of the appliance can be detected by means of said message which also reveals that the appliance is switched on, i.e. active. All the remaining active appliances in the system evaluate said messages and send such messages themselves as long as said appliances are active. The active appliances can control other active appliances or exchange data with other active appliances if required because each active appliance is thus provided with information on the other active appliances in the system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/20; H04L 29/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/14 (2006.01); G06F 13/38 (2006.01); G06F 15/16 (2006.01); G08C 15/06 (2006.01); H04B 1/20 (2006.01); H04B 3/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/413 (2006.01); H04L 29/12 (2006.01); H04N 5/765 (2006.01); G11B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147129A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147129 A2 20010628; WO 0147129 A3 20011227; AT 281713 T 20041115; DE 19961644 A1 20010628; DE 50008547 D1 20041209; EP 1240717 A2 20020918; EP 1240717 B1 20041103; ES 2232519 T3 20050601; JP 2003518803 A 20030610; JP 3727589 B2 20051214; US 2003009581 A1 20030109; US 7401166 B2 20080715

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101207

2011-09-13 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232519 T3

2005-02-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008547 P 20041209

2004-12-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030902

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR