Global Patent Index - EP 1240738 A2

EP 1240738 A2 2002-09-18 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING TARGETED ADVERTISEMENTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING TARGETED ADVERTISEMENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON GEZIELTEN WERBESENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR DES ANNONCES PUBLICITAIRES CIBLEES

Publication

EP 1240738 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00986555 A

Priority

  • US 0034421 W
  • US 46788999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147156A2] A method and system for providing targeted advertisements over a networked media delivery system, especially interactive television networks, the system comprising tracking and storing viewer selections, analyzing the selections, and delivering targeted advertisements that appeal to the particular subscriber making the selections, the system including a merge processor, a file server, a profile processor, and a broadcast server contained in a head end in communication with a plurality of set-top boxes through a distribution network. Based on a subscriber's viewing habits and account information, the present invention delivers different, customized advertisements to different viewers watching the same program or channel. The present invention delivers the advertisements as either still frame bit maps or as video streams advertisement insertion in a playlist or a broadcast media program.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 9/00; H04H 7/00; H04N 7/173

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/09 (2008.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/02 (2012.01); H04H 60/31 (2008.01); H04H 60/66 (2008.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/173 (2011.01); H04N 21/258 (2011.01); H04N 21/262 (2011.01); H04N 21/2668 (2011.01); H04N 21/442 (2011.01); H04N 21/472 (2011.01); H04N 21/658 (2011.01); H04N 21/81 (2011.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 67/22 (2013.01); G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); H04H 60/66 (2013.01); H04L 65/602 (2013.01); H04N 7/17318 (2013.01); H04N 21/25883 (2013.01); H04N 21/25891 (2013.01); H04N 21/26258 (2013.01); H04N 21/2668 (2013.01); H04N 21/44222 (2013.01); H04N 21/47202 (2013.01); H04N 21/6582 (2013.01); H04N 21/812 (2013.01); H04H 60/09 (2013.01); H04H 60/31 (2013.01); H04L 29/06027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147156A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147156 A2 20010628; WO 0147156 A3 20011213; CA 2387562 A1 20010628; CA 2387562 C 20130326; EP 1240738 A2 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAT TRICK, SERIES 83 OF ALLIED SECURITY TRUST

2017-02-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170120

2017-02-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AT&T INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY I, L.P.

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 21/81 20110101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/31 20080101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 21/658 20110101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/66 20080101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 21/258 20110101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/08 20060101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 21/442 20110101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 21/262 20110101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/09 20080101AFI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 7/173 20060101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 21/2668 20110101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 30/02 20120101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 21/472 20110101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/06 20060101ALI20161026BHEP

2016-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AT&T DELAWARE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, INC.

2016-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AT&T BLS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, INC.

2016-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AT&T INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, INC.

2007-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070827

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SWIX, SCOTT, R.

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STEFANIK, JOHN, R.

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BATTEN, JOHN, C.

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR