Global Patent Index - EP 1240795 A1

EP 1240795 A1 2002-09-18 - MOBILE TERMINAL HANDOVER FROM A SECOND GENERATION NETWORK TO A THIRD GENERATION IP-BASED NETWORK

Title (en)

MOBILE TERMINAL HANDOVER FROM A SECOND GENERATION NETWORK TO A THIRD GENERATION IP-BASED NETWORK

Title (de)

BEWEGLICHES TERMINALHANDOVER VON EINEM NETZ DES ZWEITEN ERZEUGUNG ZU EINEM IP DES DRITTEN ERZEUGUNG GRÜNDETE NETZ

Title (fr)

TRANSFERT DE TERMINAL MOBILE D'UN RESEAU DE DEUXIEME GENERATION VERS UN RESEAU IP DE TROISIEME GENERATION

Publication

EP 1240795 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00975069 A

Priority

  • SE 0002008 W
  • US 16253299 P
  • US 58546400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0131963A1] A method of handing over a mobile terminal from a second generation (2G) Anchor Mobile Switching Center (MSC(39)) in a 2G circuit-switched radio telecommunications network to a Serving General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) Service Node (SGSN(33)) in a third generation (3G) Internet Protocol (IP)-based radio telecommunications network. The handover is triggered not just by the availability of service by the 3G network, or by a stronger signal strength from the 3G network, but also by a request for a service that requires 3G coverage. In order to reduce potential handover delays, the mobile terminal is preregistered with the 3G network whenever 3G coverage is detected (44). A Handover Server (HOSV(35)) is implemented at the same hierarchical level as the MSC or the SGSN. The HOSV maintains backward compatibility with the 2G MSC during the handover procedure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/14 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/0022 (2013.01); H04W 36/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0131963A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0131963 A1 20010503; AR 029010 A1 20030604; AU 1317201 A 20010508; EP 1240795 A1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060718

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HASAN, SUHAIL

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUGIRTHARAJ, DAVID

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TRAN, HUNG

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OZKAN, IBRAHIM

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI